NE LB1195 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1195 amended into LB1014 by AM2330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1195 amended into LB1014 by AM2330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate federal funds to the Department of Economic Development to award sponsorship grants for international competitions to be hosted in Nebraska
Title
Appropriate federal funds to the Department of Economic Development to award sponsorship grants for international competitions to be hosted in Nebraska
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1195 amended into LB1014 by AM2330 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 11, 2022 |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |