NE LB1160 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the Attracting Excellence to Teaching Program and the Excellence in Teaching Cash Fund
Title
Change provisions relating to the Attracting Excellence to Teaching Program and the Excellence in Teaching Cash Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Lynne Walz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-31 | Legislature | Conrad name added |
2024-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2024 |
2024-01-16 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2024-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |