NE LB113 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Approved by Governor on March 31, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Approved by Governor on March 31, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to motor vehicle titling, licensing, registration, and fees and operators' licenses and permits and authorize a new motor carrier services system
Title
Change provisions relating to motor vehicle titling, licensing, registration, and fees and operators' licenses and permits and authorize a new motor carrier services system
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Legislature - Albrecht AM468 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Legislature - Albrecht AM468 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 31, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-03-25 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 |
2021-03-25 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2021-03-15 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST2 |
2021-03-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-03-10 | Legislature | Albrecht AM468 adopted |
2021-03-10 | Legislature | Albrecht AM226 withdrawn |
2021-03-10 | Legislature | Albrecht AM353 withdrawn |
2021-03-10 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER9 adopted |
2021-03-09 | Legislature | Albrecht AM468 filed |
2021-02-26 | Legislature | Albrecht AM353 filed |
2021-02-24 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER9 filed |
2021-02-24 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER9 |
2021-02-16 | Legislature | Albrecht AM226 filed |
2021-02-16 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-02-02 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2021 |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2021-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |