NE LB1107 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1107 amended into LB731 by AM2432
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1107 amended into LB731 by AM2432
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to barber licensing and the Cosmetology, Electrology, Esthetics, Nail Technology, and Body Art Practice Act
Title
Change provisions relating to barber licensing and the Cosmetology, Electrology, Esthetics, Nail Technology, and Body Art Practice Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Linehan [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1107 amended into LB731 by AM2432 |
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1042 amended into LB1107 by AM2293 |
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB794 amended into LB1107 by AM2293 |
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB706 amended into LB1107 by AM2293 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-03-22 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM2293 filed |
2018-03-22 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2293 |
2018-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2018 |
2018-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34585 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB1107.pdf |