NE LB1107 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the movement of vehicles and other property after an accident and provide immunity
Title
Change provisions relating to the movement of vehicles and other property after an accident and provide immunity
Sponsors
Sen. Pete Pirsch [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-01-31 | Notice of hearing for February 08, 2012 | |
2012-01-23 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | |
2012-01-19 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=15976 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB1107.pdf |