NE LB1106 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Linehan AM2873 filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Eliminate obsolete sales tax provisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminate obsolete sales tax provisions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25LegislatureLinehan AM2873 filed
2020-03-25LegislatureLinehan AM2871 filed
2020-03-25LegislatureLinehan AM2872 filed
2020-03-25LegislatureRevenue AM2870 filed
2020-03-25LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM2870
2020-02-21LegislatureScheer priority bill
2020-02-12LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 19, 2020
2020-01-24LegislatureReferred to Revenue Committee
2020-01-22LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback