NE LB1106 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1108 amended into LB1106 by AM2389
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1108 amended into LB1106 by AM2389
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change forfeiture provisions as prescribed
Title
Change forfeiture provisions as prescribed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-13 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 38-8-3 (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1108 amended into LB1106 by AM2389 |
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 19, 2016 |
2016-04-13 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 13, 2016 |
2016-04-13 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2016-04-13 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 38-8-3 |
2016-04-13 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2016-04-13 | Legislature | Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate withdrawn |
2016-04-07 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST91 |
2016-04-07 | Legislature | Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate filed |
2016-04-07 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2016-04-07 | Legislature | Mello AM2920 adopted |
2016-04-07 | Legislature | Mello AM2920 filed |
2016-04-07 | Legislature | Garrett AM2840 adopted |
2016-04-07 | Legislature | Garrett AM2840 filed |
2016-04-07 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER251 adopted |
2016-04-05 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER251 filed |
2016-04-05 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER251 |
2016-04-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2016-04-04 | Legislature | Judiciary AM2389 adopted |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Judiciary AM2389 filed |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2389 |
2016-02-22 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2016-02-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2016 |
2016-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |