NE LB110 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Medical Cannabis Act
Title
Adopt the Medical Cannabis Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Attorney General Opinion 19-010 to La Grone |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Crawford AM1865 pending |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Chambers MO97 withdrawn |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Chambers MO97 Bracket until June 6, 2019 filed |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Morfeld MO96 withdrawn |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Morfeld MO96 Recommit to the Judiciary Committee filed |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Crawford AM1865 pending |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Crawford AM1865 filed |
2019-05-15 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1680 pending |
2019-05-10 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1680 filed |
2019-05-10 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1680 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Wishart AM21 filed |
2019-01-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2019 |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-11 | Legislature | Wishart priority bill |
2019-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37628 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB110.pdf |