NE LB11 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Approved by Governor on March 29, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Approved by Governor on March 29, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to transfer of juvenile cases and appeal of such transfers
Title
Change provisions relating to transfer of juvenile cases and appeal of such transfers
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Krist [N] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Legislature | Krist explanation of vote |
2017-03-23 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 23, 2017 |
2017-03-23 | Legislature | Wayne explanation of vote |
2017-03-23 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-03-23 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2017-03-20 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST2 |
2017-03-16 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-03-16 | Legislature | Krist AM552 adopted |
2017-03-08 | Legislature | Krist AM552 filed |
2017-02-27 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2017-02-23 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-02-23 | Legislature | Krist AM302 adopted |
2017-02-21 | Legislature | Krist AM302 filed |
2017-01-23 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2017-01-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 18, 2017 |
2017-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |