NE LB11 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change participation and reimbursement provisions under the Managed Care Plan Network Adequacy Act
Title
Change participation and reimbursement provisions under the Managed Care Plan Network Adequacy Act
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Krist [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-02-03 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 02, 2015 |
2015-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2015-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |