NE LB1096 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1096 amended into LB1008 by AM2737
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1096 amended into LB1008 by AM2737
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate funds to the Department of Correctional Services
Title
Appropriate funds to the Department of Correctional Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1096 amended into LB1008 by AM2737 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2020 |
2020-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41517 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB1096.pdf |