NE LB1091 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 11, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 11, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Update references to the Internal Revenue Code
Title
Update references to the Internal Revenue Code
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Smith [N] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-06 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-06 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 06, 2018 |
2018-04-06 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-04-06 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-03-23 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-02-21 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2018-02-14 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2018-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 07, 2018 |
2018-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2018-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |