NE LB1091 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1091 amended into LB957 by AM2217
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1091 amended into LB957 by AM2217
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State intent relating to appropriations for purposes of the Site and Building Development Fund
Title
State intent relating to appropriations for purposes of the Site and Building Development Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1091 amended into LB957 by AM2217 |
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2016 |
2016-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=28882 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB1091.pdf |