NE LB1091 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 11, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 11, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Prepaid Wireless Surcharge Act and eliminate certain charges on prepaid wireless service
Title
Adopt the Prepaid Wireless Surcharge Act and eliminate certain charges on prepaid wireless service
Sponsors
Sen. Deb Fischer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Approved by Governor on April 11, 2012 | |
2012-04-05 | Presented to Governor on April 05, 2012 | |
2012-04-05 | President/Speaker signed | |
2012-04-05 | Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 | |
2012-04-03 | Placed on Final Reading with ST100 | |
2012-04-03 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2012-04-03 | Enrollment and Review ER270 adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Enrollment and Review ER270 filed | |
2012-04-02 | Placed on Select File with ER270 | |
2012-03-29 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2012-03-29 | Krist AM2559 withdrawn | |
2012-03-19 | Hadley name added | |
2012-03-19 | Krist AM2559 filed | |
2012-02-21 | Speaker priority bill | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on General File | |
2012-02-03 | Notice of hearing for February 13, 2012 | |
2012-01-20 | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Date of introduction |