NE LB1076 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1076 amended into LB1131 by AM2456
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1076 amended into LB1131 by AM2456
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to eligible programs for the Community College Gap Assistance Program Act
Title
Change provisions relating to eligible programs for the Community College Gap Assistance Program Act
Sponsors
Sen. Kate Bolz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1076 amended into LB1131 by AM2456 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-02-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 11, 2020 |
2020-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2020-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=40719 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB1076.pdf |