NE LB1069 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions related to the Committee on Americanism
Title
Change provisions related to the Committee on Americanism
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Bolz AM2878 filed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Chambers FA160 filed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Chambers FA157 filed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Chambers FA156 filed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Chambers FA155 filed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Chambers FA154 filed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Chambers FA153 filed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Chambers FA152 filed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Chambers FA151 filed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Brasch AM2902 pending |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Brasch AM2902 filed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Brasch AM2382 pending |
2018-03-29 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2018-03-29 | Legislature | Brasch MO296 prevailed |
2018-03-26 | Legislature | Brasch AM2382 filed |
2018-03-26 | Legislature | Brasch MO296 Place on General File filed |
2018-02-26 | Legislature | Hilkemann name added |
2018-02-26 | Legislature | Bostelman name added |
2018-02-22 | Legislature | McCollister name added |
2018-02-21 | Legislature | Friesen name added |
2018-02-21 | Legislature | Riepe name added |
2018-02-21 | Legislature | Lindstrom name added |
2018-02-21 | Legislature | Hughes name added |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Brasch priority bill |
2018-02-15 | Legislature | Kuehn name added |
2018-02-15 | Legislature | Linehan name added |
2018-02-15 | Legislature | Stinner name added |
2018-02-14 | Legislature | Briese name added |
2018-02-13 | Legislature | Halloran name added |
2018-02-13 | Legislature | Williams name added |
2018-02-13 | Legislature | Clements name added |
2018-02-13 | Legislature | Hilgers name added |
2018-02-13 | Legislature | Watermeier name added |
2018-02-13 | Legislature | Geist name added |
2018-02-08 | Legislature | Brewer name added |
2018-02-08 | Legislature | Murante name added |
2018-02-08 | Legislature | Erdman name added |
2018-02-08 | Legislature | Lowe name added |
2018-02-08 | Legislature | Thibodeau name added |
2018-02-08 | Legislature | Albrecht name added |
2018-02-08 | Legislature | Groene name added |
2018-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2018 |
2018-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2018-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34510 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB1069.pdf |