NE LB1069 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB1069 amended into LB1071 by AM2103
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB1069 amended into LB1071 by AM2103
Summary
Change technology purchase and funding provisions relating to educational service units
Title
Change technology purchase and funding provisions relating to educational service units
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Adams [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB1069 amended into LB1071 by AM2103 | |
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2010-01-26 | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2010 | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to Education Committee | |
2010-01-21 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=10114 |