NE LB106 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Approved by Governor on May 24, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Approved by Governor on May 24, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the use of county sales and use taxes for public safety services as prescribed
Title
Authorize the use of county sales and use taxes for public safety services as prescribed
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Schilz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | Approved by Governor on May 24, 2011 | |
2011-05-18 | Presented to Governor on May 18, 2011 | |
2011-05-18 | President/Speaker signed | |
2011-05-18 | Passed on Final Reading 43-3-3 | |
2011-05-09 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2011-05-04 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2011-05-04 | Enrollment and Review ER100 adopted | |
2011-04-27 | Enrollment and Review ER100 filed | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on Select File with ER100 | |
2011-04-26 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2011-04-26 | Louden AM870 adopted | |
2011-04-26 | Revenue AM731 adopted | |
2011-03-28 | Louden AM870 filed | |
2011-03-14 | Revenue AM731 filed | |
2011-03-14 | Placed on General File with AM731 | |
2011-03-10 | Louden priority bill | |
2011-01-19 | Notice of hearing for January 27, 2011 | |
2011-01-10 | Referred to Revenue Committee | |
2011-01-06 | Date of introduction |