NE LB1057 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to arraignments, filing of juvenile petitions, and jurisdiction of juvenile courts
Title
Change provisions relating to arraignments, filing of juvenile petitions, and jurisdiction of juvenile courts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-02-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 23, 2024 |
2024-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |