NE LB1054 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate federal funds to the University of Nebraska to modernize academic research laboratories and equipment for the College of Education, Health, and Human Sciences at the University of Nebraska at Omaha
Title
Appropriate federal funds to the University of Nebraska to modernize academic research laboratories and equipment for the College of Education, Health, and Human Sciences at the University of Nebraska at Omaha
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 17, 2022 |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |