NE LB1051 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1051 amended into LB845 by AM2868
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1051 amended into LB845 by AM2868
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to family member visitation
Title
Change provisions relating to family member visitation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1051 amended into LB845 by AM2868 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-02-28 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2018-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 22, 2018 |
2018-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34103 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB1051.pdf |