NE LB105 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to payment of fees and costs associated with deaths of incarcerated persons and grand juries
Title
Change provisions relating to payment of fees and costs associated with deaths of incarcerated persons and grand juries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-03-11 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM415 filed |
2015-03-11 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM415 |
2015-02-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 12, 2015 |
2015-01-15 | Legislature | Rereferred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2015-01-12 | Legislature | Kolterman name added |
2015-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2015-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |