NE LB1049 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Redefine terms to include students in virtual schools in the state aid formula
Title
Redefine terms to include students in virtual schools in the state aid formula
Sponsors
Sen. Burke Harr [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-02-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 08, 2016 |
2016-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2016-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=28721 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB1049.pdf |