NE LB1043 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1043 amended into LB700 by AM1704
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1043 amended into LB700 by AM1704
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change retirement provisions for certain school employees
Title
Change retirement provisions for certain school employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1043 amended into LB700 by AM1704 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-31 | Legislature | Kolterman AM1667 filed |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2022 |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee |
2022-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
2022-01-18 | Legislature | Kolterman motion to suspend rules to permit introduction of bill prevailed |
2022-01-12 | Legislature | Kolterman motion to suspend rules to permit introduction of bill filed |