NE LB104 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Provisions/portions of LB501 amended into LB104 by AM525
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Provisions/portions of LB501 amended into LB104 by AM525
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change sales and use tax increases under the Local Option Revenue Act and provide tax incentives for renewable energy projects under the Nebraska Advantage Act
Title
Change sales and use tax increases under the Local Option Revenue Act and provide tax incentives for renewable energy projects under the Nebraska Advantage Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB501 amended into LB104 by AM525 |
2013-06-05 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB266 amended into LB104 by AM1484 |
2013-06-05 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on June 04, 2013 |
2013-05-30 | Legislature | Seiler explanation of vote |
2013-05-29 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 29, 2013 |
2013-05-29 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2013-05-29 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 38-2-9 |
2013-05-29 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2013-05-29 | Legislature | Schilz AM1494 withdrawn |
2013-05-29 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File failed |
2013-05-29 | Legislature | Chambers FA125 withdrawn |
2013-05-28 | Legislature | Schilz AM1494 filed |
2013-05-23 | Legislature | Chambers FA125 filed |
2013-05-22 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST28 |
2013-05-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2013-05-21 | Legislature | Chambers AM1484 adopted |
2013-05-21 | Legislature | Chambers AM1484 filed |
2013-05-21 | Legislature | Schilz AM1359 withdrawn |
2013-05-21 | Legislature | Schilz AM1359 filed |
2013-05-21 | Legislature | Hadley AM1446 adopted |
2013-05-21 | Legislature | Chambers FA91 adopted |
2013-05-21 | Legislature | Chambers FA91 pending |
2013-05-21 | Legislature | Chambers FA91 filed |
2013-05-21 | Legislature | Hadley AM1446 pending |
2013-05-21 | Legislature | Smith AM1408 lost |
2013-05-21 | Legislature | McCoy AM1216 withdrawn |
2013-05-21 | Legislature | Smith AM1236 withdrawn |
2013-05-21 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER86 adopted |
2013-05-16 | Legislature | Hadley AM1446 filed |
2013-05-15 | Legislature | Smith AM1408 filed |
2013-05-07 | Legislature | McCoy AM1216 filed |
2013-05-07 | Legislature | Smith AM1236 filed |
2013-04-30 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER86 filed |
2013-04-30 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER86 |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | Revenue AM525 adopted |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | Smith AM1123 withdrawn |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | Smith AM1123 filed |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | Chambers MO55 failed |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | Chambers MO55 Recommit to the Revenue Committee filed |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | Revenue AM525 pending |
2013-03-13 | Legislature | Hadley name added |
2013-03-13 | Legislature | Dubas name added |
2013-03-13 | Legislature | Lathrop priority bill |
2013-03-12 | Legislature | Revenue AM525 filed |
2013-03-12 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM525 |
2013-03-07 | Legislature | Nordquist name added |
2013-03-07 | Legislature | Mello name added |
2013-02-06 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 14, 2013 |
2013-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2013-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |