NE LB1034 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1034 amended into LB746 by AM2381
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1034 amended into LB746 by AM2381
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the Nebraska Children's Commission
Title
Change provisions relating to the Nebraska Children's Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1034 amended into LB746 by AM2381 |
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-03-07 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM2230 filed |
2016-03-07 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2230 |
2016-02-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 19, 2016 |
2016-01-21 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-01-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=28748 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB1034.pdf |