NE LB1030 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - DeKay explanation of vote
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - DeKay explanation of vote
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the County Bridge Match Program and provide for a transfer of funds from the Roads Operations Cash Fund
Title
Change provisions of the County Bridge Match Program and provide for a transfer of funds from the Roads Operations Cash Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | DeKay explanation of vote |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 15, 2024 |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 11, 2024 |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2024-04-04 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2024-04-03 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2024-03-25 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2024-03-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2024-02-20 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2024-02-14 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2024-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2024 |
2024-01-10 | Legislature | Brewer name added |
2024-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2024-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |