NE LB1023 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1023 amended into LB1011 by AM1999
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1023 amended into LB1011 by AM1999
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Jobs and Economic Development Initiative Act and the Water Recreation Enhancement Act and change provisions relating to the Statewide Tourism And Recreational Water Access and Resource Sustainability Special Committee of the Legislature
Title
Adopt the Jobs and Economic Development Initiative Act and the Water Recreation Enhancement Act and change provisions relating to the Statewide Tourism And Recreational Water Access and Resource Sustainability Special Committee of the Legislature
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 38-6-5 (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Legislature - Motion to return to Select File failed (Y: 6 N: 30 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-03-29 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Legislature - Hilgers AM2300 adopted (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. AM2546 lost (Y: 6 N: 25 NV: 13 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-03-29 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. AM2496 adopted (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 17 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Legislature - Natural Resources AM1914 adopted (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Legislature - Motion to return to Select File failed (Y: 6 N: 30 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-03-29 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Legislature - Hilgers AM2300 adopted (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. AM2546 lost (Y: 6 N: 25 NV: 13 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-03-29 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. AM2496 adopted (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 17 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Legislature - Natural Resources AM1914 adopted (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1023 amended into LB1011 by AM1999 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 12, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 38-6-5 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. AM2691 not considered |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File failed |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO207 withdrawn |
2022-04-05 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. AM2691 filed |
2022-04-05 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO207 Bracket until April 20, 2022 filed |
2022-03-30 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2022-03-29 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2022-03-29 | Legislature | Hilgers AM2300 adopted |
2022-03-29 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. AM2573 withdrawn |
2022-03-29 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. AM2546 lost |
2022-03-29 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. AM2496 adopted |
2022-03-24 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. AM2573 filed |
2022-03-23 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. AM2496 pending |
2022-03-23 | Legislature | Hilgers AM2300 pending |
2022-03-23 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER139 adopted |
2022-03-23 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. AM2546 filed |
2022-03-22 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. AM2496 filed |
2022-03-14 | Legislature | Hilgers AM2300 filed |
2022-03-11 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER139 filed |
2022-03-11 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER139 |
2022-03-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2022-03-09 | Legislature | Natural Resources AM1914 adopted |
2022-02-28 | Legislature | Natural Resources AM1914 filed |
2022-02-28 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1914 |
2022-02-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2022 |
2022-01-27 | Legislature | McDonnell priority bill |
2022-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2022-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |