NE LB1022 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the office of Legislative Audit and change dates for application of tax incentives
Title
Change provisions relating to the office of Legislative Audit and change dates for application of tax incentives
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 44-4-1 (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 18, 2016 |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 12, 2016 |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 44-4-1 |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate withdrawn |
2016-04-07 | Legislature | Groene AM2676 withdrawn |
2016-04-07 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File withdrawn |
2016-04-07 | Legislature | Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate filed |
2016-03-23 | Legislature | Groene AM2676 filed |
2016-03-15 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2016-03-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2016-03-10 | Legislature | Schumacher AM2398 lost |
2016-03-07 | Legislature | Schumacher AM2398 filed |
2016-02-25 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2016-02-23 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2016-02-23 | Legislature | Executive Board AM2170 adopted |
2016-02-18 | Legislature | Executive Board AM2170 filed |
2016-02-18 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2170 |
2016-02-10 | Legislature | Mello name added |
2016-02-10 | Legislature | Legislative Performance Audit priority bill |
2016-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2016 |
2016-01-21 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2016-01-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |