NE LB1017 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-24 - Bill withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-24 - Bill withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change and eliminate pipeline siting provisions and eminent domain provisions
Title
Change and eliminate pipeline siting provisions and eminent domain provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Krist [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-24 | Legislature | Bill withdrawn |
2018-01-24 | Legislature | Krist MO178 prevailed |
2018-01-19 | Legislature | Krist MO178 Withdraw bill filed |
2018-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2018-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34503 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB1017.pdf |