NE LB1009 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - Approved by Governor on March 30, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - Approved by Governor on March 30, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit transactions involving lookalike substances, provide and change seizure and forfeiture authority, and prohibit conduct as deceptive trade practices
Title
Prohibit transactions involving lookalike substances, provide and change seizure and forfeiture authority, and prohibit conduct as deceptive trade practices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 30, 2016 |
2016-03-24 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 24, 2016 |
2016-03-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2016-03-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 |
2016-03-24 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2016-03-18 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST70 |
2016-03-17 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2016-03-17 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER179 adopted |
2016-03-10 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER179 filed |
2016-03-10 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER179 |
2016-03-07 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2016-03-07 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1960 adopted |
2016-02-17 | Legislature | Fox priority bill |
2016-02-05 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1960 filed |
2016-02-05 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1960 |
2016-01-28 | Legislature | Fox name added |
2016-01-20 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 28, 2016 |
2016-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |