NE LB1007 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the Security, Privacy, and Dissemination of Criminal History Information Act
Title
Change provisions relating to the Security, Privacy, and Dissemination of Criminal History Information Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Haar [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-01-29 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2014 |
2014-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2014-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=22174 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB1007.pdf |