NE LB1 | 2021 | 107th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Flood Explanation of Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Flood Explanation of Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Set district boundaries of the Representatives in the Congress of the United States
Title
Set district boundaries of the Representatives in the Congress of the United States
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-30 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 35-11-3 (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-09-24 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-24 - Legislature - Linehan AM36 adopted (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-17 - Legislature - Linehan MO2 failed (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-09-24 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-24 - Legislature - Linehan AM36 adopted (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-17 - Legislature - Linehan MO2 failed (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-30 | Legislature | Flood Explanation of Vote |
2021-09-30 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on September 30, 2021 |
2021-09-30 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on September 30, 2021 |
2021-09-30 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-09-30 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 35-11-3 |
2021-09-28 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2021-09-28 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-09-28 | Legislature | Hansen, M. MO9 withdrawn |
2021-09-28 | Legislature | Hansen, M. MO7 withdrawn |
2021-09-28 | Legislature | Hansen, M. MO9 pending |
2021-09-28 | Legislature | Hansen, M. MO7 pending |
2021-09-28 | Legislature | Hansen, M. MO9 Bracket until September 30, 2021 filed |
2021-09-28 | Legislature | Wayne MO8 withdrawn |
2021-09-28 | Legislature | Wayne MO8 Bracket until September 30, 2021 filed |
2021-09-28 | Legislature | Hansen, M. MO7 Recommit to Redistricting Committee filed |
2021-09-28 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2021-09-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-09-24 | Legislature | Linehan AM36 adopted |
2021-09-24 | Legislature | Linehan AM36 filed |
2021-09-24 | Legislature | Hunt AM16 withdrawn |
2021-09-24 | Legislature | Hunt AM23 withdrawn |
2021-09-24 | Legislature | McCollister AM25 withdrawn |
2021-09-24 | Legislature | Morfeld AM17 withdrawn |
2021-09-24 | Legislature | Linehan AM18 withdrawn |
2021-09-24 | Legislature | Linehan AM20 withdrawn |
2021-09-24 | Legislature | Hansen, M. AM12 withdrawn |
2021-09-24 | Legislature | Wayne MO1 withdrawn |
2021-09-17 | Legislature | Hunt AM16 filed |
2021-09-17 | Legislature | Hunt AM23 filed |
2021-09-17 | Legislature | McCollister AM25 filed |
2021-09-17 | Legislature | Morfeld AM17 filed |
2021-09-17 | Legislature | Linehan AM18 filed |
2021-09-17 | Legislature | Linehan AM20 filed |
2021-09-17 | Legislature | Wayne MO1 pending |
2021-09-17 | Legislature | Hansen, M. AM12 pending |
2021-09-17 | Legislature | Linehan MO2 failed |
2021-09-17 | Legislature | Linehan MO2 Invoke cloture filed |
2021-09-17 | Legislature | Wayne MO1 Recommit to Redistricting Committee filed |
2021-09-17 | Legislature | Hansen, M. AM12 filed |
2021-09-17 | Legislature | Blood AM15 withdrawn |
2021-09-17 | Legislature | Blood AM15 pending |
2021-09-17 | Legislature | Blood AM15 filed |
2021-09-17 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2021-09-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 16, 2021 |
2021-09-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 15, 2021 |
2021-09-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 14, 2021 |
2021-09-13 | Legislature | Referred to Redistricting Committee |
2021-09-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |