NE LB1 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-18 - Approved by Governor on February 17, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-18 - Approved by Governor on February 17, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Revisor bill to repeal an obsolete section relating to a transfer of property taking place in 1994
Title
Revisor bill to repeal an obsolete section relating to a transfer of property taking place in 1994
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-12 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on February 17, 2015 |
2015-02-12 | Legislature | Davis explanation of vote |
2015-02-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 12, 2015 |
2015-02-12 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2015-02-12 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 |
2015-02-12 | Legislature | Krist FA10 withdrawn |
2015-02-12 | Legislature | Krist FA10 filed |
2015-02-12 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File withdrawn |
2015-02-12 | Legislature | Chambers FA9 withdrawn |
2015-02-12 | Legislature | Chambers FA9 filed |
2015-02-12 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File withdrawn |
2015-01-30 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2015-01-27 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2015-01-26 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2015-01-23 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2015-01-23 | Legislature | Chambers MO4 withdrawn |
2015-01-23 | Legislature | Chambers MO4 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2015-01-12 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2015-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |