ND SCR4013 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution urging North Dakota to continue its endorsement and support of the relationship and shared interests between the people of the Republic of China (Taiwan) and the State of North Dakota.
Title
A concurrent resolution urging North Dakota to continue its endorsement and support of the relationship and shared interests between the people of the Republic of China (Taiwan) and the State of North Dakota.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Miller [R] | Sen. Tim Flakoll [R] | Sen. Rich Wardner [R] | Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] |
Rep. Kim Koppelman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/26 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2015-03-23 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2015-03-20 | House | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 12 0 2 |
2015-03-20 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |