ND SCR4008 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-15 - Signed by President
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-15 - Signed by President
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution urging the United States Environmental Protection Agency to request an additional 12-month stay of mandate for implementation of the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals ruling in the matter of National Cotton Council of America et al., v. United States Environmental Protection Agency.
Title
A concurrent resolution urging the United States Environmental Protection Agency to request an additional 12-month stay of mandate for implementation of the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals ruling in the matter of National Cotton Council of America et al., v. United States Environmental Protection Agency.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Brandenburg [R] | Sen. Jim Dotzenrod [D] | Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] | Sen. Jerry Klein [R] |
Sen. Joe Miller [R] | Rep. Phillip Mueller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-15 | Signed by President | |
2011-03-24 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-23 | Returned to Senate | |
2011-03-22 | Second reading, adopted | |
2011-03-18 | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 15 0 0 | |
2011-03-11 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-02-24 | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee | |
2011-02-23 | Received from Senate | |
2011-02-22 | Second reading, adopted | |
2011-02-18 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 | |
2011-02-17 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |