ND SB2358 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Rep. L. Meier, Nathe A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 43-28.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a dental loan repayment program; and to provide an appropriation.
Title
Introduced by Rep. L. Meier, Nathe A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 43-28.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a dental loan repayment program; and to provide an appropriation.
Sponsors
Sen. Dick Dever [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-07 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-03 | Returned to Senate | |
2009-04-03 | Second reading, passed, yeas 053 nays 035 | |
2009-04-02 | Laid over one legislative day | |
2009-03-23 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 012 n 011 | |
2009-03-17 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-10 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services | |
2009-02-17 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-16 | Second reading, passed, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-02-12 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 014 n 000 | |
2009-02-04 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-01-30 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-01-28 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2009-01-20 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2358.html |