ND SB2327 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Signed by Governor 04/07
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Signed by Governor 04/07
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new subdivision to subsection? 2 of section 12-60-24, title? 23.1, and subdivision? v of subsection? 1 of section? 54-06-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the creation of the department of environmental quality, the transfer of duties and responsibilities of the state department of health relating to environmental quality to the department of environmental quality, and biennial reports of the department of environmental quality; to amend and reenact section 4-35.2-01, subdivision b of subsection 5 of section 6-09.4-03, sections 11-33-01, 11-33-02.1, and 11-33-22, subdivision? d of subsection? 2 of section 12.1-06.1-01, sections 15-05-16, 20.1-13-05, 20.1-17-01, and 23-01-02, subsection? 8 of section 23-01.3-01, sections 23-20.2-02, 23-20.2-03, and 24-03-23, subsection? 5 of section 28-32-50, sections 38-08-04.5, 38-11.1-03.1, 38-11.1-04.1, and 38-11.2-02, subsection 12 of section 38-14.1-03, subsection 2 of section 38-14.1-21, sections 38-22-07, 38-22-12, 40-47-01, 43-18-02, 43-18-09, 43-35-03, 43-35-19, 43-35-19.1, 43-35-19.2, 43-35-20, and 43-35-23, subsection 11 of section 43-48-03, sections? 43-62-01 and 43-62-03, subsection? 1 of section? 43-62-15, subsection 3 of section 44-04-18.4, section 44-04-32, subsection? 1 of section 54-07-01.2, subsection 3 of section 54-12-08, section 54-44.3-30, subsection? 33 of section 57-43.2-01, sections 58-03-11, 58-03-11.1, and 58-03-17, subsection? 13 of section 58-06-01, section 61-04.1-04, subsections? 1 and 2 of section? 61-28-02, subsection? 2 of section? 61-28.1-02, subsection? 15 of section? 61-28.1-03, subsection? 2 of section? 61-28.2-01, and sections 61-29-04, 61-33-09, and 61-35-24 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the transfer of duties and responsibilities of the state department of health to the department of environmental quality and the regulation of x-ray operators; to repeal chapters 19-10 and 19-16.1, sections 23-01-01.2, 23-01-04.1, 23-01-23, 23-01-30, and 23-01-36, chapters 23-20, 23-20.1, 23-20.3, 23-20.5, 23-25, 23-26, 23-29, 23-29.1, 23-31, 23-32, 23-33, 23-37, and 39-26, and sections 61-28-03 and 61-28-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the transfer of duties and responsibilities of the state department of health to the department of environmental quality; to provide a penalty; to provide a continuing appropriation; to provide for transition; and to provide an effective date.
Title
The transfer of duties and responsibilities of the state department of health to the department of environmental quality; to provide a penalty; to provide a continuing appropriation; to provide for transition; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] | Sen. Kelly Armstrong [R] | Sen. Rich Wardner [R] | Rep. Al Carlson [R] |
Rep. Keith Kempenich [R] | Rep. Todd Porter [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 27 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 27 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/07 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 31 nays 16 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Concurred |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Laid over one legislative day |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-03-28 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 69 nays 23 |
2017-03-28 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-27 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 1 |
2017-03-16 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2017-03-16 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2017-03-10 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2017-03-03 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 27 nays 17 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 1 0 |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Request return from committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |