ND SB2323 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 37-01-45 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the record of veterans.
Title
The record of veterans.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Sorvaag [R] | Sen. Randall Burckhard [R] | Sen. Ron Carlisle [R] | Rep. James Kasper [R] |
Rep. Karen Rohr [R] | Rep. Blair Thoreson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/20 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Concurred |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2015-04-13 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2015-04-13 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 23 0 0 |
2015-03-16 | House | Committee Hearing 04:00 |
2015-03-09 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2015-03-09 | House | Amendment adopted |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Laid over one legislative day |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Laid over one legislative day |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |