ND SB2319 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 39
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 39
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 38-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to indemnity agreements in oil and gas production contracts.
Title
Indemnity agreements in oil and gas production contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 7 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 39 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |