ND SB2317 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 40
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 40
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 38-25-05, 38-25-06, and 38-25-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the amalgamation of the underground storage of oil and gas; to repeal section 38-25-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to amalgamating property interests; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Amalgamating property interests; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 7 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-17 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 40 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred to Energy and Natural Resources |