ND SB2312 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact subsection 9 of section 39-29.2-03 and sections 39-29.2-05 and 39-29.2-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to unconventional vehicles; to amend and reenact subsection 3 of section 26.1-40-01, subsection 10 of section 26.1-41-01, subsection 49 of section 39-01-01, subsection 1 of section 39-04-36, subsection 2 of section 39-29.2-01, subsection 5 of section 39-29.2-03, subsection 7 of section 39-29.2-03, and section 39-29.2-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to unconventional vehicles; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Unconventional vehicles; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/20 |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-16 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-14 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 2, Emergency clause carried |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2015-04-07 | House | Conference committee appointed Owens Sukut Hanson |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Rust Campbell Sinner |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2015-04-01 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2015-04-01 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2015-03-31 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-03-30 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2015-03-20 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Transportation Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 41 nays 4, Emergency clause carried |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |