ND SB2299 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Signed by Governor 04/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Signed by Governor 04/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 16.1-08.1-03.13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to campaign contribution statements required of initiated petition sponsoring committees; to amend and reenact section 16.1-08.1-01, subsection
Title
Campaign finance; to provide a penalty; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Luick [R] | Sen. Carolyn Nelson [D] | Sen. Rich Wardner [R] | Rep. Karen Karls [R] |
Rep. Gary Paur [R] | Rep. Blair Thoreson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/26 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-19 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2013-04-19 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-18 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-11 | House | Conference committee appointed Louser Laning Mooney |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Armstrong Lyson Grabinger |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2013-04-01 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 89 nays 4 |
2013-04-01 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-03-29 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2013-03-15 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-02-21 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 4 |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |