ND SB2298 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 50-11.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the establishment of early childhood services inclusion support services and a grant program for licensed early childhood services providers who care for children with special needs; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide an appropriation.
Title
The establishment of early childhood services inclusion support services and a grant program for licensed early childhood services providers who care for children with special needs; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide an appropriation.
Sponsors
Rep. Lois Delmore [D] | Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] | Rep. Robert Kilichowski [D] | Sen. Richard Marcellais [D] |
Sen. Tim Mathern [D] | Rep. Ralph Metcalf [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Filed with Secretary Of State 05/17 | |
2011-05-20 | Signed by Governor 05/17 | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-22 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-21 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2011-04-20 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-20 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Conference committee appointed Kreidt Hawken Metcalf | |
2011-04-08 | Refused to concur | |
2011-04-06 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2011-04-06 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 16 5 0 | |
2011-03-24 | Amendment adopted | |
2011-03-22 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 5 0 | |
2011-03-14 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2011-02-24 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee | |
2011-02-23 | Received from Senate | |
2011-02-22 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-21 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 0 | |
2011-02-10 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-02-10 | Amendment adopted | |
2011-02-09 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 0 | |
2011-02-02 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-01-21 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |