ND SB2287 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-04 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 020 nays 027
Status: Introduced on January 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-04 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 020 nays 027
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Ekstrom, Hawken, Nottestad A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 50-24.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a medicaid family planning services waiver.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Ekstrom, Hawken, Nottestad A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 50-24.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a medicaid family planning services waiver.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-04 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 020 nays 027 | |
2009-02-03 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 005 n 001 | |
2009-01-26 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2009-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2287.html |