ND SB2286 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 4 of section 43-32-19.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to regulation of applied behavioral analysts.
Title
Regulation of applied behavioral analysts.
Sponsors
Sen. Nicole Poolman [R] | Sen. Scott Meyer [R] | Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] | Rep. Mike Nathe [R] |
Rep. Michelle Strinden [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-18 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |