ND SB2262 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 34
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 34
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 16.1-09-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the contents of personal disclosure statements.
Title
The contents of personal disclosure statements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-15 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 34 | |
2011-02-11 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 2 0 | |
2011-01-27 | Committee Hearing 09:15 | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/bill-actions/ba2262.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/documents/11-0354-01000.pdf |