ND SB2236 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 43-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to cosmetology apprenticeship programs.
Title
Cosmetology apprenticeship programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Jordan Kannianen [R] | Sen. Nicole Poolman [R] | Rep. Mike Lefor [R] | Rep. Dave Nehring [R] |
Rep. Emily O'Brien [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-03 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |