ND SB2221 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-05 - Motion to reconsider failed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-05 - Motion to reconsider failed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 53-06.2-10.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to historic horse race wagering; and to amend and reenact sections 50-06-22, 53-06.2-01, 53-06.2-04, 53-06.2-05, and 53-06.2-06, subsection 1 of section 53-06.2-08, and sections 53-06.2-10, 53-06.2-10.1, and 53-06.2-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the compulsive gambling prevention and treatment fund and the regulation of historic horse racing.
Title
The compulsive gambling prevention and treatment fund and the regulation of historic horse racing.
Sponsors
Sen. Kelly Armstrong [R] | Sen. Randall Burckhard [R] | Sen. Jon Casper [R] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] |
Rep. Kim Koppelman [R] | Rep. Mike Nathe [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 45 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | Motion to reconsider failed |
2017-04-04 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 45 nays 46 |
2017-04-04 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-04-03 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 9 2 |
2017-03-22 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported back, do pass 8 7 0 |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 30 nays 15 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Reported back, do pass 4 2 0 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Request return from committee |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |