ND SB2217 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Rep. D. Johnson, R. Kelsch, Mueller A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 15.1-20-03 and 39-06-01.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to compulsory school attendance and motor vehicle operators' licenses; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Introduced by Rep. D. Johnson, R. Kelsch, Mueller A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 15.1-20-03 and 39-06-01.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to compulsory school attendance and motor vehicle operators' licenses; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-09 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-08 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-18 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-17 | Returned to Senate | |
2009-03-16 | Second reading, passed, yeas 075 nays 018 | |
2009-03-13 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 013 n 000 | |
2009-03-11 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education | |
2009-02-17 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-16 | Second reading, passed, yeas 044 nays 003 | |
2009-02-13 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-12 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 004 n 001 | |
2009-02-09 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-21 | Rereferred to Education | |
2009-01-21 | Request return from committee | |
2009-01-14 | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2217.html |